Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Quintanilla, Cecilia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Quintanilla, Edis Danery, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Elizabeth Hendrickson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1108 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1217 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2017 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Elizabeth Hendrickson |
||
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Returned Mail: Family Law Status Conference Order Dated February 1, 2017 Filed | |
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Returned Mail: Family Law Status Conference Order Dated February 1, 2017 Filed | |
February 01, 2017 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Elizabeth Hendrickson |
||
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Order Issued | |
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 05/01/2017 02:30 PM D- 520 | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Filed | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.