Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Almaguer, Javier Jr, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Boydine A. Hall presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 27, 2013 |
CategoryParental Relationship/Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions123 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Case Cycle Time123 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations Filed | |
October 23, 2013 |
Notice of Motion re
Judge: Boydine Hall |
||
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 10/23/2013 09:00 AM D- 508 | |
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of re: Continuance Filed | |
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 09/11/2013 09:00 AM D- 508 | |
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion re Child Support,.. Filed by Petitioner | |
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Answer to Governmental Complaint Filed for Javier Almaguer JR | |
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations As to Javier Almag |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.