Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valencia, Roque, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Loya, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time965 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to Maria Loya Filed | |
December 05, 2014 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Brad Seligman |
||
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
May 09, 2014 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Brad Seligman |
||
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Order Issued | |
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 12/05/2014 09:00 AM D- 504 | |
November 14, 2013 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Brad Seligman |
||
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 05/09/2014 09:00 AM D- 504 | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Order Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.