Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perez, Francisca, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Perez, Eduardo, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Michael M. Markman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2013 |
CategoryDv-100 Request For Order, Domestic Violence Prevention |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time1314 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2016 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
July 06, 2016 |
Request for Order re: Modification...
Judge: Andrew Steckler |
||
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 08/15/2016 09:00 AM D- 522 | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Request for Order re: Modification... As to Eduardo Perez Filed | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Domestic Violence Hearing 07/06/2016 09:30 AM D- 514 | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Domestic Violence Hearing 07/06/2016 09:00 AM D- 514 | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Order re: Modification... Other/Additional Orders Filed by Petitioner | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 07/06/2016 09:30 AM D- 511 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.