Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Daniels, Patricia L., filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Pulido, Armando R., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2005 |
CategoryDv-100 Request For Order, Domestic Violence Prevention |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time218 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2006 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Henry E. Needham, Jr. |
||
July 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Dismissed | |
July 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Filed | |
January 18, 2006 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Henry E. Needham, Jr. |
||
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing Granted | |
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 07/19/2006 08:30 AM D- 511 | |
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (In Person) - CLETS on Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention As to Arman | |
December 28, 2005 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Henry E. Needham, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.