Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wu, Ealang Yeeling, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wu, Stanislaus Kam-Ho, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Elizabeth Hendrickson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions869 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1128 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Hearing Dropped from dept: 507 date: 02/19/2009 time: 09:00 AM | |
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration dec to drop the court date of 02/19/2009 Filed | |
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Application Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Ealang Yeeling Wu Granted | |
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Order to Show Cause and Affidavit for Contempt As to Stanislaus Kam-Ho | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Hearing 12/24/2008 02:00 PM D- FHO | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 02/19/2009 09:00 AM D- 507 | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Order Granting OSC & Affidavit For Contempt Filed | |
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Application Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Hearing Ordered | |
December 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Application Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed for Ealang Yeeling Wu |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.