Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Royalty Jane, Royalty Jeffrey, Royalty Malcolm B. Jr, Royalty Preston, Shrader Steven, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Gibson Diane Hunter, Henner Murray, against Colee Janice P, Hanson Michael, Lpl Financial Llc, Royalty Timothy E., Royalty-Ward Marjorie, (total of 5) See All represented by Thomas Wendy May, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Coleman A. Swart presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2001 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
OTHER - PETITION TO COMPEL ACCOUNT AND DISTRIBUTION
Date: November 17, 2014OTHER - SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION TO COMPEL ACCOUNT & DISTRIBUTION
Date: January 27, 2015Notice of Hearing (Probate)
Date: January 28, 2015Minute Order
Date: January 28, 2015Notice of Related case
Date: February 02, 2015Minute Order
Date: March 04, 2015Case File - Public
Date: March 25, 2015Minute Order
Date: August 20, 2015Notice of Ruling
Date: August 24, 2015Minute Order
Date: October 29, 2015Minute Order
Date: December 17, 2015OTHER - DECLARATION OF TRACY A. STEVENSON REGARDING URGENCY OF ISSUANCE OF ORDER
Date: January 20, 2016Order - ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING DIRECTING TRUSTEE TO DELIVER BALANCE OF TRUST FUNDS, ETC.
Date: January 20, 2016First accounting and report of trustee
Date: February 16, 2016Notice of Entry of Order
Date: January 28, 2016Minute Order
Date: February 17, 2016Order - FOLLOWING HEARING DIRECTING PLP FINANCIAL AND WELLS FARGO, ETC...
Date: February 17, 2016Notice of Entry of Order
Date: February 19, 2016Notice of Hearing (Probate)
Date: February 29, 2016Notice of Hearing (Probate)
Date: March 04, 2016Notice of Hearing (Probate)
Date: March 14, 2016Request for Special Notice
Date: March 17, 2016Minute Order
Date: March 28, 2016OTHER - ADDITIONAL PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 29, 2016Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2016Application - Appear Pro Hac Vice
Date: May 17, 2016Declaration
Date: May 17, 2016Notice - Hearing
Date: May 18, 2016Minute Order
Date: May 24, 2016Minute Order
Date: May 26, 2016Notice - Ruling
Date: June 02, 2016Notice - Hearing
Date: June 20, 2016Minute Order
Date: June 21, 2016Opposition - of the Surety to Petition to Construe Trust and Surcharge Trustee
Date: June 22, 2016Response - to Malcolm B. Royalty, Jr.'s Objections to First Accounting etc..
Date: June 29, 2016Minute Order
Date: July 13, 2016Minute Order
Date: July 29, 2016Request - Special Notice
Date: August 05, 2016Declaration - of urgency re petn for approval of settlement agreement
Date: October 04, 2016Minute Order
Date: October 05, 2016Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name
Date: October 14, 2016Minute Order
Date: November 21, 2016Notice - To Steven Shrader To Appear In Court
Date: November 29, 2016Order - Granting Petition for Court Approval of Settlement Agreement
Date: December 02, 2016Notice - Of Entry Of Order Granting Petition For Court Approval Of Settlement Agreement
Date: December 12, 2016Minute Order
Date: January 23, 2017Notice - To Steven Shrader To Appear In Court For Trial Setting
Date: January 24, 2017Notice - to Steven Shrader to Appear in Court for Trial Setting
Date: February 14, 2017Minute Order
Date: March 27, 2017Notice - Of Filing Of Bankruptcy By Steven Shrader
Date: March 28, 2017Notice - Continuance - Of Hearings
Date: March 28, 2017Petition - Compel - Petition Damages to Trust
Date: July 07, 2017Summons
Date: July 07, 2017Notice - Association of Counsel
Date: July 07, 2017Minute Order
Date: July 11, 2017Response - Respondent LPL Financial LLC's Answer to Petitioner's Unverified Complaint
Date: August 24, 2017Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner - Petitioner Attorney for Petitioner
Date: September 18, 2017Order - Stipulation
Date: December 13, 2017Response - Respondent Michael Hanson's Answer to Petitioner's Unverified Complaint
Date: January 08, 2018Receipt - Receipt
Date: January 24, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 06, 2018Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: February 15, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 27, 2018Order - Stipulation
Date: March 12, 2018Order - Order on Respondent LPL Financial
Date: March 23, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 10, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2018Opposition - Opposition to Motion
Date: April 25, 2018Notice - Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: April 26, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 08, 2018Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner
Date: May 08, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 14, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 03, 2018Notice - Intent to Appear by Telephone - Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: September 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 21, 2018Notice - Continuance
Date: October 22, 2018Notice - Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: October 31, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 02, 2018Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: November 05, 2018Request - Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: January 18, 2019Request - Dismissal
Date: April 08, 2019Notice of Hearing (Probate)
Date: April 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2019 | Request - Dismissal | ||
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Request - Dismissal | |
January 18, 2019 | Request - Dismissal - Request for Dismissal | ||
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request - Dismissal (Request for Dismissal ) Filed by Surety Company Filed by Surety Company |
|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request - Dismissal (Request for Dismissal ) Filed by Surety Company |
|
November 05, 2018 | Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling | ||
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice - Ruling (Notice of Ruling ) Filed by Surety Company Filed by Surety Company |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice - Ruling (Notice of Ruling ) Filed by Surety Company |
|
November 02, 2018 | Minute Order | ||
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding Petition Hearing - Held Petition Hearing - Held Judge: Penny Brenda J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.