Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cheong Ieng Hou, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lou Man Hou, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions52 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time322 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cheong, Ieng - Filed and Entered on 2016-04-28 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cheong, Ieng - Signed on 2016-04-15 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Change of Address (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cheong, Ieng ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 3 Completed/No Disposition (Entered Date: 10-22-15 ) | |
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Community Property - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cheong, Ieng ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- Filed By: Petitioner: Cheong, Ieng ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.