Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Perez Lupita, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Perez Homero, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions45 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time171 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2015-11-19 ) | |
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Signed on 2015-11-16 ) | |
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Signed on 2015-11-16 ) | |
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2015-11-19 ) | |
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- Filed and Entered on 2015-07-13 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- Notice to:: Respondent: Perez, Homero, mailed: 07-15-15 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Perez, Lupita ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 07-16-15 ) | |
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.