Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia Alfredo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rodriguez Gabriela, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Mary Thornton House presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department L, Silberman, Harvey A., Presiding FCCR Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Judge: Harvey A. |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - FCCR Conference (- Scheduled & Notice Mailed on 2017-04-27 ) | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Assigned to Court (Entered Date: 05-04-17 ) | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | 4th Notice Sent/Assignment to Court (Entered Date: 05-04-17 ) | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (FL-115 - Filed By: Petitioner: Garcia, Alfredo - Service Date on 2016-12-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons - Amended (- Filed By: Petitioner: Garcia, Alfredo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Separate Property - Filed By: Petitioner: Garcia, Alfredo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition-Amended (- Filed By: Petitioner: Garcia, Alfredo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Community Property - Filed By: Petitioner: Garcia, Alfredo ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.