Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Blancaflor Ronaldo M., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bahinting Marites V., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions87 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- Filed By: Petitioner: Blancaflor, Ronaldo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed By: Petitioner: Blancaflor, Ronaldo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and Final Declaration - Filed By: Petitioner: Blancaflor, Ronaldo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 08-27-15 ) | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- Filed By: Petitioner: Blancaflor, Ronaldo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Blancaflor, Ronaldo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- Notice to:: Respondent: Bahinting, Marites, mailed: 08-26-15 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 08-27-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Blancaflor, Ronaldo - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.