Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Soliman Michelle, filed a(n) Dissolution - Commercial case represented by Lizarraga Rebecca Dolores, against Tan Genevieve, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 19, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution-Domestic Partnership W/O Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions216 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDissolution |
|
Case Cycle Time304 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Soliman, Michelle ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Soliman, Michelle ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Soliman, Michelle ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Soliman, Michelle ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Soliman, Michelle ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 3 Completed/No Disposition (Entered Date: 03-26-15 ) | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (And Final Declaration Of Disclosure - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Soliman, Michelle ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (And Final Declaration Of Disclosure - On Behalf of: Respondent: Tan, Genevieve ) Filed by Respondent |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Soliman, Michelle ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.