Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vargas Frances, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Law Office Of Bob M. Cohen & Assocs., against Varughese Jacob, Munemura Marsha Law Offices Of, represented by Munemura Marsha Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pasadena Courthouse with JAN A. PLUIM presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management145 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HousePasadena Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeReclassified-Limited-Alhambra |
Case Cycle Time145 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department P Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Transfer to Municipal Court) - |
|
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department P, JAN A. PLUIM, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Transfer to Municipal Court Judge: JAN A. PLUIM |
|
May 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by FRANCES VARGAS (Plaintiff) |
|
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by JACOB VARUGHESE (Defendant); MUNEMURA, MARSHA LAW OFFICES OF (Legacy Party) |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department P Status Conference (Status Conference; Matter continued) - |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department P, JAN A. PLUIM, Presiding Status Conference - Matter continued Judge: JAN A. PLUIM |
|
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CMC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.