Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Home Vest Capital Llp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Palmer John, Dba Centurion Lock And Key Serv., Aka Palmer John L., Aka Palmer Ii John L., Aka Paler John L., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pasadena Courthouse with JOSEPH DE VANON presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HousePasadena Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time140 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department S Unknown Event Type |
|
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by HOME VEST CAPITAL LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
May 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by HOME VEST CAPITAL LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
May 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department S, JOSEPH DE VANON, Presiding Motion Hearing (WRIT OF ATTACHMENT) - Matter continued Judge: JOSEPH DE VANON |
|
March 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department S (Motion Hearing; Matter continued) - |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Motion for an Order | |
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion for an Order (WRIT OF ATTACHMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.