Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Pacheco, John M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2009 | Hearing | Update Complaint of Comment UPDATE COMPLAINT OF FCS DESTRUCTION YR ADDED | |
December 11, 2008 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Pacheco, John M Comment COURT TRIAL SET FOR PETITION FOR GUARDIANSHIP OF JUDITH ROSAASEN JOHN M PACHECO PRESIDING. CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO COURT REPORTER JEAN THOMPSON;4403 BAILIFF: E CEBALLOS - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER JUDITH ROSAASEN, KENNETH ROSAASEN PRESENT FATHER PRESENT IN PRO PER. MOTHER JAMIE DELEON PRESENT IN PRO PER. - PROCEEDINGS: WITNESS -- JUDITH/KENNETH/LAUREN ROSAASEN/JAMIE DELEON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. ALL PARTIES REQUEST TERMINATION OF THE GUARDIANSHIP MATTER COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION FOR GUARDIANSHIP OF JUDITH ROSAASEN ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
December 11, 2008 | Hearing | Court Trial Original Type Court Trial Judicial Officer Pacheco, John M Hearing Time 02:00 PM Result Held Comment COURT TRIAL SET FOR PETITION FOR GUARDIANSHIP OF JUDITH ROSAASEN | |
November 17, 2008 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment HEARING RE: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN | |
November 17, 2008 | Hearing | Hearing on Petition for Appointment of Guardian Original Type Hearing on Petition for Appointment of Guardian Hearing Time 8:30 AM Comment HEARING RE: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN | |
November 13, 2008 | Hearing | Report Filed Comment REPORT SPECIAL REPORT FILED | |
September 08, 2008 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Pacheco, John M Comment HEARING RE: EXPARTE PTN TO SET ASIDE/SUSPEND TEMP GUARDIANSHIP JOHN M PACHECO PRESIDING. CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO COURT REPORTER JEAN THOMPSON;4403 BAILIFF: E CEBALLOS - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER JUDITH ROSAASEN, KENNETH ROSAASEN PRESENT FATHER - KEN ROSAASEN PRESENT IN PRO PER. MOTHER JAMIE DELEON PRESENT IN PRO PER. - PROCEEDINGS: WITNESS -- JUDITH/KENNETH/KEN ROSAASEN AND JAMIE DELEON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. THE COURT IS IN RECEIPT OF THE COURT INVESTIGATOR'S REPORT - PETITIONER'S OBJECT TO THE RECOMMENDATION - THE COURT SETS A TRIAL DATE FOR THE OBJECTION - JUDITH ROSAASEN, KENNETH ROSAASEN'S MOTION FOR APPT OF GUARDIAN IS DENIED. THE MINOR CHILDREN LAUREN AND GIANNI ROSAASEN BE RETURNED TO FATHER KEN ROSAASEN BY 5PM TODAY - HEARINGS: COURT TRIAL ON PETITION FOR GUARDIANSHIP OF JUDITH ROSAASEN IS SET FOR 12/11/08 AT 02:00 IN DEPARTMENT S11 PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
September 08, 2008 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Pacheco, John M Comment HEARING RE: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN JOHN M PACHECO PRESIDING. CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO COURT REPORTER THERESA HEINTZ;6024 BAILIFF: E CEBALLOS - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER JUDITH ROSAASEN, KENNETH ROSAASEN PRESENT KEN ROSAASEN (FATHER) PRESENT IN PRO PER. JAMIE DELEON (MOTHER) PRESENT IN PRO PER. - PROCEEDINGS: WITNESS -- JUDITH/KENNETH/KEN ROSAASEN AND JAMIE DELEON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. - THE COURT INVESTIGATOR'S OFFICE REQUEST ADDITIONAL TIME TO CONDUCT A HOME STUDY - FATHER GRANTED VISITATION WITH BOTH MINOR'S ON SUNDAY FROM 9AM TO 6PM. MID WEEK VISITATION ON MONDAY/WED/THURSDAY'S FROM 3PM TO 9PM - ALL EXISTING ORDERS SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/17/08 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S11P. PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) REFERRED TO COURT INVESTIGATOR FOR INVESTIGATION AND REPORT. REFERRED TO COURT INVESTIGATOR FOR INVESTIGATION AND REPORT. COURT INVESTIGATOR NOTIFIED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
September 08, 2008 | Hearing | Hearing Re: Original Type Hearing Re: Judicial Officer Pacheco, John M Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment HEARING RE: EXPARTE PTN TO SET ASIDE/SUSPEND TEMP GUARDIANSHIP | |
September 08, 2008 | Hearing | Hearing on Petition for Appointment of Guardian Original Type Hearing on Petition for Appointment of Guardian Judicial Officer Pacheco, John M Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment HEARING RE: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.