Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Vander Feer, John P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2015 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2015 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Vander Feer, John P Comment HEARING RE: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN JOHN P VANDER FEER,JUDGE CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS COURT REPORTER KIM MCGILVARY;11522 COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL - APPEARANCES: VERONICA MIRANDA PRESENT IN PRO PER. - PROCEEDINGS: PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) DISPOSITION ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
December 17, 2015 | Hearing | Hearing on Petition for Appointment of Guardian Original Type Hearing on Petition for Appointment of Guardian Judicial Officer Vander Feer, John P Hearing Time 11:00 AM Result Held Comment HEARING RE: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN | |
December 16, 2015 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION ETC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 12/14/15 AS TO SEE LIST, FILED. | |
December 16, 2015 | Hearing | Family Court Services Re: Comment FAMILY COURT SERVICES: CFS RPT SENT TO PROBATE VIA COURT COURIER | |
December 16, 2015 | Hearing | CFS Report Received Comment CFS REPORT RECEIVED 12/16/15 | |
December 10, 2015 | Hearing | Probate Notes - Hearing Date of Comment HRG OF 12/17/15 - PROBATE NOTES | |
December 08, 2015 | Hearing | Probate Notes - Hearing Date of Comment HRG OF 12/14/15 - PROBATE NOTES | |
December 03, 2015 | Hearing | Referred to CFS - Referral Number: Comment REFERRED TO CFS-REFERRAL NUMBER 1290-7017-7368-3090395 | |
November 24, 2015 | Hearing | Probate Notes - Hearing Date of Comment HRG OF 12/14/15 - PROBATE NOTES | |
November 17, 2015 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Vander Feer, John P Comment HEARING RE: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN/CONSERVATOR JOHN P VANDER FEER,JUDGE CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD. EX PARTE ORDERS DENIED CHILD IS IN CUSTODY OF MOTHER. ALLEGATIONS OF PARENTAL UNFITNESS. THE COURT ORDERS THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILY SERVICES TO PREPARE REPORT PURSUANT TO PROBATE CODE 1513. COURT ORDERS MATTER REFERRED TO DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILY SERVICES PURSUANT TO PROBATE CODE 1513(B) FOR INVESTIGATION IN COMPLIANCE WITH WELFARE AND INSTITUTIONS CODE 328 AND 329. - COURT INVESTIGATOR TO MAKE EMERGENCY REFERRAL TO CHILD PROTECTIVE SERVICES. COURT INVESTIGATOR NOTIFIED. - HEARINGS: HEARING DATE OF 12/17/15 CONFIRMED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.