Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Askeland, Eric K., Morgan, Eileen J., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michelle Gilleece presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Gilleece Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2023 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a petition for the appointment of a guardian of the person. The petitioner, Paul R. Campos Jr., is seeking the court's appointment of a guardian for a minor. The form GC-210 can be used to petition the court for this appointment. Th...
Initial Petition for Guardianship
Date: February 06, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: February 06, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 06, 2023Duties of Guardian Form filed
Date: February 06, 2023Declaration re:
Date: March 02, 2023Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Declaration Under UCCJEA Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Ex Parte Application Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed
Date: February 16, 2023Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: March 14, 2023Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: March 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service CI RPT RTND. NO MAIL RECEPTACLE. NO PO BOX PROVIDED AS TO LISA MORGAN |
|
June 27, 2023 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian Filed | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued - Person | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to be filed | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: RQST TO EXCUSE NOTICE WITH DUE DILIGENCE |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Investigator's Report Filed (Confidential) | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Assigned to Guardianship Investigator TM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.