Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Malloy, Mariam, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Mann, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2023 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a petition for the appointment of a guardian for Geojonni Perez and Eric Perez, who are minors. The petitioner, Mariam Malloy, requests to be appointed as the guardian of the person of the minors and for letters to be issued upon qu...
Declaration Under UCCJEA Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 10, 2023Consent of Prop Guar/Nomination of Guardian/Consent to Appt
Date: January 10, 2023Initial Petition for Guardianship
Date: January 10, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: January 10, 2023Duties of Guardian Form filed
Date: January 10, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: January 10, 2023Proof of Service
Date: January 12, 2023Consent of Prop Guar/Nomination of Guardian/Consent to Appt
Date: January 12, 2023Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: May 24, 2023Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: March 02, 2023Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: March 02, 2023Declaration Under UCCJEA Filed
Date: March 02, 2023Proof of Service
Date: January 18, 2023Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: January 17, 2023Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: May 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 |
Department V12 - Victorville
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
||
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Filed AS TO GEOJONNI PEREZ |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed AS TO GRANDFATHER JONNY PEREZ |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Purchased LETTERS |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letters Issued AS TO GEOJONNI PEREZ |
|
October 31, 2023 |
Department V12 - Victorville
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
||
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Investigator's Report Filed (Confidential) | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued - Temporary | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Assigned to Guardianship Investigator LC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.