Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cooper, Christopher, Drake, Sheila, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas K Mann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a petition for the appointment of a guardian for a minor or minors. The petitioner is requesting that a specific person be appointed as the guardian of the person and/or estate of the minor(s) named in item 2. The petitioner also re...
Initial Petition for Guardianship
Date: September 27, 2022Duties of Guardian Form filed
Date: September 27, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: September 27, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 27, 2022Declaration Under UCCJEA Filed
Date: September 27, 2022Consent of Prop Guar/Nomination of Guardian/Consent to Appt
Date: February 03, 2023Consent of Prop Guar/Nomination of Guardian/Consent to Appt
Date: September 27, 2022Return Mail
Date: March 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed | |
August 28, 2023 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued - Temporary | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed OF CHRISOPHER COOPER & SHEILA DRAKE - AMENDED |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Under UCCJEA Filed AMENDED |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Duties of Guardian Form filed AMENDED |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian AMENDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.