Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Brown, Tiffany, Gladney, Thenia, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michelle Gilleece presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a petition for the appointment of a guardian for a minor named Taj Ezekel Johnson. The petitioners, Thenia Gladney and Tiffany Brown, are requesting to be appointed as guardians of the person of the minor. They have provided their c...
Letters Issued - Person
Date: December 13, 2022Order Appointing Guardian Filed
Date: December 13, 2022Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: July 29, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 29, 2022Consent of Prop Guar/Nomination of Guardian/Consent to Appt
Date: July 29, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: July 29, 2022Duties of Guardian Form filed
Date: July 29, 2022Declaration Under UCCJEA Filed
Date: July 29, 2022Initial Petition for Guardianship
Date: July 29, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: July 29, 2022Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: August 08, 2022Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: August 08, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: September 06, 2022Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: September 06, 2022Indian Child Inquiry Attachment Filed
Date: December 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued - Person | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian Filed | |
December 13, 2022 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Signed | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Indian Child Inquiry Attachment Filed | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Investigator's Report Filed (Confidential) | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Assigned to Guardianship Investigator NP |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY GUARDIANSHIP AND FOR AMENDED LETTERS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.