Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pro Se filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Reilly, Tara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order Appointing Guardian Filed
Date: August 03, 2023Declaration Under UCCJEA Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Letters Issued - Person
Date: August 03, 2023Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: May 25, 2023Indian Child Inquiry Attachment Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: May 25, 2023Consent of Prop Guar/Nomination of Guardian/Consent to Appt
Date: May 20, 2022Duties of Guardian Form filed
Date: May 20, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: May 20, 2022Initial Petition for Guardianship
Date: May 20, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 20, 2022Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: May 20, 2022Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: May 20, 2022Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: May 26, 2022Declaration Under UCCJEA Filed
Date: May 20, 2022Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed
Date: June 23, 2022Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: June 23, 2022Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: October 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Indian Child Inquiry Attachment Filed | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian Filed | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued - Person | |
August 03, 2023 |
Department S37 - SBJC
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
||
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Signed | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Under UCCJEA Filed | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued - Temporary | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: EXTENDING TEMP GUARDIANSHIP |
|
May 25, 2023 |
Department S37 - SBJC
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.