Case Last Refreshed: 6 days ago
Garrett, Dolores, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas K Mann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Duties of Guardian Form filed
Date: December 29, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 29, 2021Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Initial Petition for Guardianship
Date: December 29, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: December 29, 2021Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: February 18, 2022Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: May 18, 2022Consent of Prop Guar/Nomination of Guardian/Consent to Appt
Date: December 29, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: July 18, 2022Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: August 17, 2022Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: August 17, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Declaration Under UCCJEA Filed
Date: September 15, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Request for Continuance Filed
Date: October 05, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 23, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: October 14, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 13, 2022Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: November 17, 2022Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: November 23, 2022Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: February 09, 2023Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: February 09, 2023Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: May 18, 2023Indian Child Inquiry Attachment Filed
Date: May 18, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 18, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 18, 2023Temporary Letters Issued
Date: January 06, 2022Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Declaration Under UCCJEA Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Proof of Service
Date: January 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 |
Department V12 - Victorville
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PRELIMINARY ENROLLMENT CHECK FROM PASCUA YAQUI TRIBE |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service FORWARD TIME EXPIRED- RETURN TO SENDER |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File CERTIFIED MAIL FROM PASCUA YAQUI TRIBE |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service RETURN TO SENDER |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: REASSIGNMENT |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service by Mail Sent Re: BIOLOGICAL MOTHER - CYNTHIA TATUM TO ADDRESS LISTED ON INDIAN ATTACHMENT |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service by Mail Sent Re: PASCUA TRIBE BASED ON ADDRESS FOUND ON BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service by Mail Sent Re: BIOLOGICAL FATHER - MICHAEL SHADY TO ADDRESS LISTED ON INDIAN ATTACHMENT |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Letters Issued - Temporary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.