Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alamos Slaten, Barbara, Moreno, Elizabeth, Nehrlings, Jacalyn, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Gilleece, Michelle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilleece, Michelle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Petition Hearing
Date: July 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Re: Visitation by Mother Elizabeth Moreno Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
**PR - Portal Minute Order Petition Hearing PETITION FOR VISITATION BY MOTHER ELIZABETH MORENO Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service BY MAIL ON 7/22/21 TO ELIZABETH MORENO |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes PETITION FOR VISITATION BY MOTHER ELIZABETH MORENO |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed GUARDIAN BARBARA ALAMOS SLATEN'S OBJECTION TO THE PETITION FOR VISITATION |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service BY MAIL TO P,O. BOX ON 7/22/21 TO ELIZABETH MORENO |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed FROM PRO PER TO ATTY MATTHEW SHEASBY |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DUE DILLIGENCE |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE ON 6/15/21 |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.