Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Gomez, Michael, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel Detienne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2022 |
Department R19 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Libutti, Michael R |
||
March 28, 2022 |
Department R19 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Brodie, Kyle S |
||
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 30th day is: | |
March 23, 2022 |
Department R19 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Brodie, Kyle S |
||
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | 30th day is: | |
March 01, 2022 |
Department R19 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Libutti, Michael R |
||
February 24, 2022 |
Department R19 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Libutti, Michael R |
||
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Matter continued per emergency order pursuant to GC 68115. | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | 30th day is: | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Court finds good cause to continue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.