Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lucero, Marco, represented by Feild, Skip Allen, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Cara D Hutson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2023 |
Department R5 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Widman, Joseph B |
||
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Probation Officer Notified | |
January 27, 2023 |
Department R5 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Widman, Joseph B |
||
January 06, 2023 |
Department R5 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Widman, Joseph B |
||
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Parties Notified | |
October 26, 2022 |
Department R5 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Hutson, Cara D |
||
July 27, 2022 |
Department R5 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Hutson, Cara D |
||
July 08, 2022 |
Department R5 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Lee, Corey G |
||
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Probation Officer Notified | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Relinquishment Form Findings CR-210 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.