Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Leal, Adalberto, represented by Bullard, Jeffrey Scott, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John P Vander Feer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 |
Department V8 - Victorville
Judge: Vander Feer, John P |
||
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Probation Officer Notified | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Request To Calendar Case In-Person | |
August 25, 2022 |
Department V8 - Victorville
Judge: Vander Feer, John P |
||
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Probation Officer Notified | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Request To Calendar Received By Phone | |
October 07, 2021 |
Department V9 - Victorville
Judge: Morton, Miriam I |
||
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy Sent: CR210 TO PROBATION |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Relinquishment Form Findings FILED |
|
September 09, 2021 | Hearing | Dispo / Reset Judicial Officer Morton, Miriam I Hearing Time 8:30 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.