Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Morton, Miriam I presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2020 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2021 | Hearing | Bail Bond Exonerated | |
August 26, 2021 | Hearing | Preliminary Hearing View Document **Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Morton, Miriam I Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held | |
August 24, 2021 | Hearing | Time waiver previously given to: | |
August 24, 2021 | Hearing | Pre-Preliminary Hearing View Document **Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Morton, Miriam I Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held | |
July 22, 2021 | Hearing | Time waiver previously given to: | |
July 22, 2021 | Hearing | Dispo / Reset View Document **Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Morton, Miriam I Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion | |
July 22, 2021 | Hearing | Preliminary Hearing Judicial Officer Morton, Miriam I Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated | |
July 20, 2021 | Hearing | Time waiver previously given to: | |
July 20, 2021 | Hearing | Pre-Preliminary Hearing View Document **Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Morton, Miriam I Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held | |
June 07, 2021 | Hearing | Defendant waives time for Preliminary Hearing to: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.