Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Morton, Miriam I presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2019 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 | Hearing | Jury Trial Judicial Officer Vander Feer, John P Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated | |
August 13, 2021 | Hearing | Trial Readiness Judicial Officer Vander Feer, John P Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Bail Bond Exonerated Comment X2 | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | 1538.5 Motion Heard | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Jury Trial Judicial Officer Vander Feer, John P Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Pretrial View Document **Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Vander Feer, John P Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held | |
July 23, 2021 | Hearing | Trial Readiness Judicial Officer Vander Feer, John P Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated | |
July 22, 2021 | Hearing | Opposition to the Motion Filed Comment PEOPLE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SUPRESS EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO PENAL CODE 1538.5 WALKED TO DEPT V8 | |
July 16, 2021 | Hearing | Motion Filed Comment TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO PENAL CODE 1538.5; POINTS & AUTHORITIES & ARGUMENT IN SUPPORT THEREOF PLACED IN DEPT V8 JA BIN | |
June 29, 2021 | Hearing | 60th day is: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.