Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Cdebaca, William Andrew, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with William Jefferson Powell, IV presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Department of Corrections Notified Sent certified corrected m.o. dated 08/23/21 |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Action- No Appearance- Response by Judge | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Request For Review Received From The Dept of Corrections | |
August 26, 2021 | Hearing | Prison Packet Receipt Is Received By The Court From The Sher | |
August 25, 2021 | Hearing | Prison Pack Sent Via Sheriff's Transportation | |
August 25, 2021 | Hearing | Abstract of Judgment - State Prison | |
August 23, 2021 | Hearing | Commitment Issued | |
August 23, 2021 | Hearing | Sentenced for a total determinate term of: Comment 3 years 0 month | |
August 23, 2021 | Hearing | Ordered Fees to be Collected by DOC | |
August 23, 2021 |
Department S2 - SBJC
Judge: Bilash, Colin J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.