Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Account and Report PREGRANT ORDER Department 4’s courtroom is open to the public. However, because of emergency orders and public health directives related to the COVID-19 pandemic, appearances need n...
Judge: E. BRADLEY NELSON |
|
January 11, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Account and Report PREGRANT ORDER Department 4’s courtroom is open to the public. However, because of emergency orders and public health directives related to the COVID-19 pandemic, appearances need n...
Judge: E. BRADLEY NELSON |
|
November 21, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Petition for Approval of Fourth Account Current of Trustee for the Period of July 1, 2016 to July 31, 2018; Approval of Trustee’s Fees; Approval of Attorney’s Fees PREGRANT ORDER The court finds all n...
Judge: ALESIA JONES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.