Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Petition for Approval of Fifth Account Current of Trustee for the Period of June 1, 2018 to May 31, 2020; Approval of Trustee’s Fees; Approval of Attorney’s Fees; Declaration of Randolph M. Sharon PRE...
Judge: ALESIA JONES |
|
September 20, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Petition for Approval of Fourth Account Current of Trustee for the Period of June 1, 2016 to May 31, 2018; Approval of Trustee’s Fees; Approval of Attorney’s Fees PREGRANT ORDER In light of the Supple...
Judge: ALESIA JONES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.