Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Jose De Jesus Macias Figueroa, Claudia G Macias, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Claudia Guadalupe Macias, Jose De Jesus Macias Figueroa, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Samra Furbush presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2023 |
CategoryFamily Law Nullity With Child(Ren) |
Last RefreshedJune 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Consolidation
Date: June 06, 2023Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: June 05, 2023Responsive Declaration to Request for Order (FL-320)
Date: June 05, 2023Child Custody Recommending Counseling Questionnaire
Date: May 30, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: May 18, 2023Family Law Case Management Order
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Order to Attend Child Custody Recommending Counseling Appointment
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: May 01, 2023Confidential Contact Information (RI-FL011)
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted
Date: May 01, 2023Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) (FL-105/GC-120)
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Petition for Nullity of Marriage (FL-100) FL-142 attached
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036)
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.