Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dawn Stewart, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against David Stewart, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Dorothy McLaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Law Dissolution Without Child(Ren) |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: March 17, 2022Proof of Service re: Notice of Limited Scope
Date: March 17, 2022Notice of Limited Scope of Respresentation
Date: March 17, 2022Family Law Case Management Order
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Request for Order re: Attorney Fees and Cost, Spousal or Partner Support filed on 01/26/2022
Date: January 26, 2022Confidential Contact Information (RI-FL011)
Date: January 13, 2022Proof of Service re: Request for Order
Date: February 23, 2022Responsive Declaration to Request for Order (FL-320)
Date: March 17, 2022Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: January 26, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) on Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by DAWN STEWARD
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.