Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Blanca Rabago Ceballos, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ricardo Ceballos, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Dorothy McLaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Law Dissolution Without Child(Ren) |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order (FL-320)
Date: February 14, 2022Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: February 14, 2022Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: December 13, 2021Proof of Service re: Request for Order
Date: December 16, 2021Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001)
Date: December 06, 2021Family Law Case Management Order
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied with Installment Payments
Date: December 07, 2021Request for Order re: Spousal or Partner Support filed on 12/06/2021
Date: December 06, 2021Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 13, 2021Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: December 06, 2021Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100 FL-142 attached
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied with Installment Payments
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Confidential Contact Information (RI-FL011)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.