Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Julia Rachel Jankowski, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Grzegorz Jankowski, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Samra Furbush presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2020 |
CategoryFamily Law Dissolution Without Child(Ren) |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Trial Brief
Date: July 29, 2022Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference Matthew Edwin Forsse, JULIA RACHEL JANKOWSKI
Date: January 20, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Jazmine Gallardo
Date: January 20, 2022Notice of In-Person Appearance
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Advisement to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Order (RI-FL009)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Stipulation to Continue MSC
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Advisement to Continue MSC
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Exhibit List for Trial
Date: July 29, 2022Witness List
Date: July 29, 2022Trial Rules and Procedures.
Date: May 26, 2022Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference Matthew Edwin Forsse, JULIA RACHEL JANKOWSKI
Date: October 19, 2021Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00DV/TRO
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00DVTRO
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Advisement to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Order (RI-FL009)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service re: MSC Brief
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00MSC BRIEF
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order (DV-100)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Confidential CLETS Information (CLETS-001)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Hearing via Remote Telephonic Appearance
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Family Law Case Management Order
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration (FL-141)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Response to Dissolution of Marriage
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Request for Settlement Conference and Trial.
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.