Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Robert Joseph Lundy, Iv, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tiffanie Lundy, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Wendy Harris presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2020 |
CategoryFamily Law Dissolution With Child(Ren) |
Last RefreshedJune 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minute Order: Hearing re: OSC RE Entry of Stipulation
Date: May 03, 2023Ex Parte Application to Restore Former Name
Date: January 19, 2023Minute Order: Hearing re: OSC RE Entry of Stipulation
Date: February 24, 2023Minute Order: Trial Readiness Conference set
Date: November 03, 2022Joint Statement of Facts and Issues Pursuant to Local Rule 5153
Date: October 24, 2022Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: October 24, 2022Agreement and Order to Reschedule Hearing (FL-308)
Date: August 17, 2022Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Agreement and Order to Reschedule hearing
Date: August 17, 2022Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Certificate of Completion of On-Line Course Up to Parents
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Income and Expense Declaration
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Child Custody Recommending Counseling Questionnaire
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Completion of On-Line Course Up to Parents
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Recommended Order Pursuant to Referral to Child Custody Recommending Counseling held on 5/25/2022
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Memorandum 6/1/2022
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Declaration of Richard Chambers
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Declaration of Richard Chambers
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Order to Attend Child Custody Recommending Counseling Appointment
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Responsive Declaration to Request for Order (FL-320)
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Responsive Declaration to Request for Order
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Declaration of John West
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Declaration of John West
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment on Dissolution of Marriage With Child(ren) filed by ROBERT JOSEPH LUNDY, IV
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration (FL-141)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) (FL-105/GC-120)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Family Law Case Management Order
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (FL-144)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: OSC RE Entry of Stipulation | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: OSC RE Entry of Stipulation | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application for Restoration of Former Name After Entry of Judgment and Order (FL-395) | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application to Restore Former Name | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Trial Readiness Conference set | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Hearing re: Request for Order RFO Custody/visitation child support, division of omitted asset-dune buggy- FC Section 2556 filed on 3/22/22 ROBERT JOSEPH LUNDY, IV, William Paul Bratton | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Joint Statement of Facts and Issues Pursuant to Local Rule 5153 | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150) | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreement and Order to Reschedule Hearing (FL-308) | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreement and Order to Reschedule hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.