Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Morales, Wilmer, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Morales, Selene, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Marquez, Leonard E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2027 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) VACATED |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Dissolution And Request for Dissolution |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration Filed | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Disclosure Preliminary |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing in Re: Application for Fee Waiver
Judge: Marquez, Leonard E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.