Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lajuan R Davis, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Evelyn Davis, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Joni T. Hiramoto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2020 |
CategoryPetn For Visitation |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW CAD BEFORE HEARING - OTHER DISMISSAL Not Applicable |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR $435.00 OR REVISED REQUEST FROM PETITIONER VACATED |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLACED ON CLERK`S CALENDAR FOR 7/24/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32
Judge: Joni T. Hiramoto |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO LAJUAN R DAVIS IS DENIED DENIED |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 32
Judge: Joni T. Hiramoto |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
F/L PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR GRANDPARENTS VISITATION FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
(FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON F.L. PETITION FILED 07/08/2020 OF LAJUAN DAVIS FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETE Not Applicable |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): RED Not Applicable |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY LAJUAN R DAVIS (CONFIDENTIAL) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.