Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jennifer Lynn Owens, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against David Allen Owens, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with John T. Laettner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution Without Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2025 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) VACATED |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) VACATED |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) VACATED |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
ON THE DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 04/09/2020 OF JENNIFER OWENS, LESLIE J MORGAN IS REMOVED AS A DEFENDANT. Not Applicable |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PRIVATE JUDGE FILED BY LES LIE J MORGAN Not Applicable |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE Not Applicable |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY JENNIFER LYNN OWENS Not Applicable |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR DISSOLUTION FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING Not Applicable |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO DAVID ALLEN OWENS FILED. DATE COPY MAILED BY CLERK TO RESPONDENT 102620. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.