Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kisha Whitehurst, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Taylor Whitehurst, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with John T. Laettner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution Without Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2025 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE W/CLERK'S CERT OF MAILING, SENT TO KISHA WHITEHURST Not Applicable |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) VACATED |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 2/23/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25
Judge: John T. Laettner |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 2/24/25 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25
Judge: John T. Laettner |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/23/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25
Judge: John T. Laettner |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/26/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25
Judge: John T. Laettner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.