Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ileana Evans, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Thomas A Evans, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Lewis A. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution Without Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
HRG ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR OTHER (SPOUSAL SUPPORT; ETC) ( ILEANA EVANS)(PRO PER) - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER 11/03/2020 HEARING RE: OTHER (SPOUSAL SUPPORT; ETC) FILED. Not Applicable |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
HRG ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR OTHER (SPOUSAL SUPPORT; ETC) ( ILEANA EVANS)(PRO PER) - Minutes Complete |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
HRG ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR OTHER (SPOUSAL SUPPORT; ETC) ( ILEANA EVANS)(PRO PER) - Minutes CONTINUED |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE ADDRESS OF PARTY THOMAS A EVANS Not Applicable |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE RECD 06/02/20 TO ILEANA EVANS Not Applicable |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL: NTC OF CONTINUANCE, RECVD 060220 FOR THOMAS A EVANS Not Applicable |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 16 | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
HRG ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR OTHER (SPOUSAL SUPPORT; ETC) ( ILEANA EVANS)(PRO PER) - Minutes CONTINUED |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
5MPF6 CALENDARED ON 04/15/20 IN DEPT. 25. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 04/15/20 IN DEPT. 16. Not Applicable Judge: Mary Ann O'Malley |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.