Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ryan Decker, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brandy Decker, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Joyce M. Cram presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoyce M. Cram Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions55 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD B Y SILKY SAHNAN ON BEHALF OF RYAN DECKER WHO IS NOW APPEARING IN PRO/PER Not Applicable |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE ADDRESS & TELEPHONE NUMBER OF PARTY RYAN DECKER Not Applicable |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
(2336) FINAL JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: 2336 JUDGMENT Not Applicable |
|
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: 2336 JUDGMENT Not Applicable |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE Not Applicable |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
F/L APPEARANCE, STIPULATION AND WAIVERS FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED. | |
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DISPO/JUDGMENT VACATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.