Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Michael John Colantuno, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Caroline Michelle Colantuno, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Joyce M. Cram presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoyce M. Cram Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time17 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event | CHECK FOR DISPO/JUDGMENT | |
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
5CLDF6 CALENDARED ON 04/22/13 IN DEPT. 22. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 04/22/13 IN DEPT. 40. Not Applicable |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE VACATED |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR RELEASE/RETURN OF MONEY; ATTORNEY FEES & COSTS ( MATTHEW M OLIVERI)(ATTY) VACATED |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR RELEASE/RETURN OF MONEY; ATTORNEY FEES & COSTS ( MATTHEW M OLIVERI)(ATTY) - Minutes CONTINUED |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. MATTHEW M OLIVERI SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR MICHAEL JOHN COLANTUNO AND IS REPLACED BY PRO/PER Not Applicable |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MICHAEL JOHN COLANTUNO Not Applicable |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE GRANTED Not Applicable |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.