Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
James Robert Warner Jr filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time20 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L OSC/TRO RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY JAMES WARNER, SR. - Minutes GRANTED |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) FILED. EXPIRES ON 01/18/12; PROTECTED PARTY IS JAMES ROBERT WARNER SR Not Applicable |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L OSC/TRO RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY JAMES WARNER, SR. - Minutes GRANTED Viewed Date Action Text Disposition Image 01/19/2011 RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) FILED. EXPIRES ON 01/18/12; PROTECTED PARTY IS JAMES ROBERT WARNER SR Not Applicable 01/19/2011 1:00 PM DEPT. 54 HEARING ON F/L OSC/TRO RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY JAMES WARNER, SR. - Minutes GRANTED 01/10/2011 (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 12/30/2010 OF JAMES WARNER AS TO JAMES ROBERT WARNER JR (SERVED ON 01/07/11) Not Applicable 12/30/2010 HEARING ON OSC/TRO D.V. WAS SET FOR 1/19/11 AT 13:00 IN DEPT. 54 12/30/2010 COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): BLUE Not Applicable 12/30/2010 CASE ENTRY COMPLETE Not Applicable 12/30/2010 REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED Not Applicable |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
(F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 12/30/2010 OF JAMES WARNER AS TO JAMES ROBERT WARNER JR (SERVED ON 01/07/11) Not Applicable |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): BLUE Not Applicable |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETE Not Applicable |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC/TRO D.V. WAS SET FOR 1/19/11 AT 13:00 IN DEPT. 54 | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.