Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lynda Ann Holloway, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ronald Stacey Holloway, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Joyce M. Cram presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoyce M. Cram Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions978 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event | CHECK FOR DISPO/JUDGMENT | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD B Y DAVID TIMKO ON BEHALF OF LYNDA ANN HOLLOWAY WHO IS NOW APPEARING IN PRO/PER Not Applicable |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE ADDRESS OF PARTY LYNDA ANN HOLLOWAY Not Applicable |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES FILED | |
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: UNFILED 2336 JUDGMENT Not Applicable |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED. | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE Not Applicable |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
F/L APPEARANCE, STIPULATION AND WAIVERS FILED Not Applicable |
|
November 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF RESPONDENTS PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY RONALD STACEY HOLLOWAY Not Applicable |
|
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
(F/L) CASE MANAGEMENT/PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Minutes COMPLETED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.