Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Darlene Lori Solis filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2007 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ Not Applicable |
|
September 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L OSC/TRO RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY DARLENE LORI SOLIS - Minutes DROPPED BY COURT |
|
September 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
(F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 08/31/2007 OF DARLENE SOLIS AS TO JAMIE LEEROY MYERS (SERVED ON 09/04/07) Not Applicable |
|
August 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE Not Applicable |
|
August 31, 2007 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC/TRO D.V. WAS SET FOR 9/20/07 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 59 | |
August 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.