Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Irene Silva, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Michael J. Silva, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 09, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution Without Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions81 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW EXPARTE RE: RESTORATION OF PETITIONERS FORMER NAME FILED | |
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
AND ORDER THEREON FILED. (PETITIONERS FORMER NAME RESTORED TO IRINA GRDZELISHVILI Not Applicable |
|
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: RESTRAING ORDER AFTER HEARING TO MICHAEL J. SILVA ON 4/21/08 Not Applicable |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
(F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON SUBSEQ. DV W/O CHILDREN FILED 03/11/2008 OF IRENE SILVA AS TO MICHAEL J. SILVA (SERVED ON 03/17/08) Not Applicable |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) FILED. EXPIRES ON 04/01/09; PROTECTED PARTY IS IRENE SILVA Not Applicable |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L OSC/TRO RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ( IRENE SILVA)(PRO PER) - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
(F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 08/09/2007 OF IRENE SILVA AS TO MICHAEL J. SILVA (SERVED ON 03/18/08) Not Applicable |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | F/L HEARING ON OSC/TRO WAS SET FOR 4/02/08 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17 | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ORDER (SUB D.V.) FILED BY IRENE SILVA AGAINST MICHAEL J. SILVA Not Applicable |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY IRENE SILVA Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.