Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Paul S Mudrich, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Marcus & Millichap, Inc. Frozen Stock Appre, Marcus & Millichapreal Estate Investment, Marcus & Millichapcompany 401K Plan, Lauri H Mudrich, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with John William Kennedy presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 09, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution Without Children |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions4864 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL ESTIMATED AT 03:00 HOURS. - Minutes | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR CHANGE OF S/S ( THOMAS W. WOLFRUM)(ATTY) - Minutes | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL ESTIMATED AT 03:00 HOURS. - Minutes | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR CHANGE OF S/S ( THOMAS W. WOLFRUM)(ATTY) - Minutes | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR CHANGE OF S/S ( THOMAS W. WOLFRUM)(ATTY) - Minutes CONTINUED |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR CHANGE OF S/S ( THOMAS W. WOLFRUM)(ATTY) - Minutes CONTINUED |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL ESTIMATED AT 03:00 HOURS. - Minutes CONTINUED |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL ESTIMATED AT 03:00 HOURS. - Minutes CONTINUED |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR CHANGE OF S/S ( THOMAS W. WOLFRUM)(ATTY) - Minutes CONTINUED |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR CHANGE OF S/S ( THOMAS W. WOLFRUM)(ATTY) - Minutes CONTINUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.