Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Patricia C Beck, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Harald Beck, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time253 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
F/L CASE CLASSIFICATION CONFERENCE (PRO PER) - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
F/L CASE CLASSIFICATION CONFERENCE (PRO PER) - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
May 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE W/CLERK'S CERT OF MAILING, SENT TO PATRICIA C BECK Not Applicable |
|
May 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE VACATED |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event | F/L CASE CLASSIFICATION CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR HEARING ON 6/28/07 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 50 | |
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
(FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 01/31/2007 OF PATRICIA BECK FILED Not Applicable |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event | CLERK'S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 5/01/07 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 50 | |
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 50 | |
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.