Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Child |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions167 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time167 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment Dissolutuion | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration: Default/Uncontested Disso | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Request | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Summons | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution Without Children | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons - Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.